LeBlanc, Serge Robert (CPSO#: 86260)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Downtown West Clinic / Archway
CAMH
1451 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6R 1A1
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 77500
Fax: (416) 539-9771
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mood and Anxiety Unit - (MAUI)
CAMH
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H1
Canada
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 32499
Fax: (416) 583-1334
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SERGE ROBERT LEBLANC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEBLANC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012