Leal Solis, Pedro (CPSO#: 72115)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Autonomus University of Chihuahua, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Mar 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2000