Lear, Naomi Diane (CPSO#: 87128)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
42 CF H Svcs Centre
Building A-47
Champlain Avenue
Oromocto NB  E2V 4J5
Phone: (506) 422 2000 Ext. 3892
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Naomi Diane Lear Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 23 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Fairlawn Medical Clinic Suite 209 2401 Yonge Street Toronto ON M4P 3H1 Phone: (416) 322-9933 Fax: (416) 322-7097
Date Received: 11 Oct 2012

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAOMI DIANE LEAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2009