Lebel, David Eduard (CPSO#: 94678)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Aug 2018

Expiry Date:  05 May 2021

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 07 Aug 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ben Gurion University of the Negev, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Surgery
S107 - 555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6686
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 07 Aug 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 07 Mar 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 08 Mar 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2018
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 05 May 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Aug 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. David Eduard Lebel may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        Division  of  Orthopaedic  Surgery, University of Toronto, in which
                        Dr. Lebel holds an academic  appointment  at  the rank of Assistant
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  seven  years  from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or  when  Dr. Lebel no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that  Dr. Lebel's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional  conduct,  or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about  Dr.  Lebel's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  August 7, 2018, and currently  has  an
                  interim expiry date of May 5, 2021.   The expiry date of this certificate
                  may be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.