Leber, Brian Frederick (CPSO#: 54493)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:McGill University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rooom A3-67
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76384
Fax: (905) 575-7320
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leber Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Leber ( CPSO# 54493 )

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Suite A3-67
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective: 26 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN FREDERICK LEBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEBER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1986