Leblanc, Roxanne Carole (CPSO#: 95928)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Nov 2017

Expiry Date:  27 Nov 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 28 Nov 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hawkesbury General Hospital
Division of General Surgery
1111 Ghislain St
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3E5
Phone: 613-632-1111
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 31 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 02 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 03 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 02 May 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 May 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2017
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 27 Nov 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jan 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Roxanne  Carole  Leblanc  may practise general surgery at Hawkesbury
                  General Hospital in Hawkesbury,  while under supervision coordinated by a
                  supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  three  years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Leblanc's eligibility to take the  Royal
                  College  of  Physicians  and  Surgeons  of  Canada  examination  expires,
                  whichever comes first.

            3.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events,  unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor  notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Leblanc's knowledge,  skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required reports to  the  College  by  the  due  date or if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Leblanc's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate is issued on November 28, 2017, and will expire  on  or
                  before November 27, 2020, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.