Lebrun, Constance Marie (CPSO#: 69598)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 18 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Aug 2015