Ledesma-Cadhit, Ma Christina Javier (CPSO#: 76531)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education:Universit of The City of Manila, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2163 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 1K2
Phone: (416) 691-3030
Fax: (416) 691-3031
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Aug 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MA CHRISTINA JAVIER LEDESMA-CADHIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEDESMA-CADHIT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2003