Ledez, Kenneth Michael (CPSO#: 56172)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dundee, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hyperbaric Medicine Service
Health Sciences Centre
300 Prince Phillip Drive
St. John's NL  A1B 3V6
Phone: (709) 777-2243
Fax: (709) 777-2527

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador
Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 16 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH MICHAEL LEDEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEDEZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1986
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Oct 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1994