Lee, Annesse Yoomee (CPSO#: 84345)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 214
1885 Glenanna Road
Pickering ON  L1V 6R6
Phone: (905) 831-0505
Fax: (905) 831-6503
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

7335 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 2B2
Canada
Phone: 905 707 7309
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Annesse Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lee ( CPSO# 84345 )

Business Address:
214 - 1885 Glenanna Road
Pickering ON  L1V 6R6
Phone Number: (905) 831-0505

Business Address:
7335 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 1P9
Phone Number: (905) 707-7309

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 22 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNESSE YOOMEE LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2012