Lee, Betty Huey-Quen (CPSO#: 84357)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Grace Health Centre
Palliative Care Unit
650 Church St
Toronto ON  M4Y 2G5
Phone: (416) 925-2251
Fax: (416) 925-3211
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health Corporation
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: 905-576-8711
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B. H. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lee ( CPSO# 84357 )

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
650 Church Street
Toronto ON  M4Y 2G5
Phone Number: (416) 925-2251

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Salvation Army Toronto Grace Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BETTY HUEY-QUEN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2009