Lee, Christie Martha (CPSO#: 81028)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 18-232
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 7499
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 208
240 Alton Towers Circle
Scarborough ON  M1V 4P3
Canada
Phone: (416) 321-2613
Fax: (416) 321-6844
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christie Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lee ( CPSO# 81028 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 18-232
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
208 - 240 Alton Tower Circle
Scarborough ON  M1V 4P3
Phone Number: (416) 321-2613

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 06 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTIE MARTHA LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008