Lee, Cindy Hok Ying (CPSO#: 81029)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MedSleep
715 MacKay St
Pembroke, ON K8A 1G8
Toronto ON  K8A 1G8
Phone: 613-735-2358
Fax: 613-735-9301
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cindy Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lee ( CPSO# 81029 )

Business Address:
715 Mackay Street
Tower D
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 735-2358

Business Address:
H7 - 825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 465-6580

Business Address:
Suite 507
586 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Phone Number: (416) 488-6980

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 06 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CINDY HOK YING LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008