Lee, Clive Chun Man (CPSO#: 68522)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Oct 1996

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of London, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V7
Phone: (416) 742-6848
Fax: (416) 742-9622
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Reproductive Care Centre
2180 Meadowvale Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5N 5S3
Canada
Phone: (905) 816-9822
Fax: (905) 816-9833
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Clive Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lee ( CPSO# 68522 )

Business Address:
203 - 2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V7
Phone Number: (416) 742-6848

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLIVE CHUN MAN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 25 Aug 1994 to 19 Oct 1994
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 09 Feb 1995 to 08 Mar 1995
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 23 Aug 1995
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Mar 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1996

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 16, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

NOTE: This decision has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.
Download Full Document (PDF)