Lee, Daniel Kam (CPSO#: 86414)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St Andrews Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone: (705) 526-1300 Ext. 1501
Fax: (705) 526-3448
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel Kam Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lee ( CPSO# 86414 )

Business Address:
1112 St. Andrews Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 526-1300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Nov 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL KAM LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2010