Lee, Edwin (CPSO#: 95563)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Upper Ottawa Medical Clinic
2-1447 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Phone: (905) 389-4976
Fax: (905) 389-2326
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

799 Bloor Street West
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M6G 1L8
Canada
Phone: 647-349-0053
Fax: 647-349-0063
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edwin Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Lee ( CPSO# 95563 )

Business Address:
2 - 1447 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Phone Number: (905) 389-4976

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWIN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 01 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2014