Lee, Ellen Fon Fay (CPSO#: 91482)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
85 Norfolk Street
Suite 302
Guelph ON  N1H 4J4
Phone: 519-822-1871
Fax: 519-822-1990
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Elliott Community
170 Metcalfe Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4Y3
Canada
Phone: (519) 822-0491
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

The Village of Riverside Glen
60 Woodlawn Rd. East
Guelph ON  N1H 8M8
Canada
Phone: 519-822-5272
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Murray and Dr. Ellen Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Lee ( CPSO# 91482 )
Dr. D. Murray ( CPSO# 91824 )

Business Address:
Homewood Health Centre
150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Phone Number: (519) 824-1010

Business Address:
Suite 302
85 Norfolk Street
Guelph ON  N1H 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-1871

Business Address:
170 Metcalfe Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4Y3
Phone Number: (519) 822-0491

Business Address:
60 Woodlawn Road East
Guelph ON  N1H 8M8
Phone Number: (519) 822-5272

Business Address:
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 837-6440

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELLEN FON FAY LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011