Lee, Hae Mi (CPSO#: 86501)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Rd.
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 7025333
Fax: (613) 7025577
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hae Mi Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Lee ( CPSO# 86501 )

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
402 - 1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone Number: (613) 702-5333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 31 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAE MI LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 08 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 09 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 09 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2013