Lee, Hubert (CPSO#: 95758)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Imaging
University of Toronto
263 McCaul Street, 4th Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 1W7
Phone: (416) 978-0514
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUBERT LEE shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. LEE is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. LEE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LEE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. LEE shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. LEE is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. LEE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019