Lee, Hyung-Suk Tommy (CPSO#: 82083)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 27 Feb 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Feb 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 03 Jan 2005 to 30 Jan 2005
Elective Trainee - Vascular Surgery

University of Ottawa, 31 Jan 2005 to 27 Feb 2005
Elective Trainee - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Feb 2005