Lee, Jason J (CPSO#: 93076)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rheumatology Centre
St. Joseph's Hospital, Level D2-172
268 Grosvenor St., P.O Box 5777
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: 519-685-8500 Ext. 13497
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 27 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON J LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinical Pharmacology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014