Lee, Jason Kihyuk (CPSO#: 89468)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 920
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone: (647) 352-2554
Fax: (866) 881-7790
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 02 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON KIHYUK LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2009