Lee, Juno (CPSO#: 76837)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 27 May 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jun 2005