Lee, Justin Yusen (CPSO#: 92819)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room 158
88 Maplewood Avenue
St. Peter's Hospital
Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton ON  L8M 1W9
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 12464
Fax: (905) 526-2062
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUSTIN YUSEN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2015