Lee, Kar Cheong (CPSO#: 85930)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: (905) 883-2065
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kar Cheong Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lee ( CPSO# 85930 )

Business Address:
York Central Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAR CHEONG LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Feb 2007 to 11 Mar 2007
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 05 Jul 2007 to 29 Jul 2007
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2007 to 09 Dec 2007
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 10 Dec 2007 to 21 Dec 2007
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009