Lee, Kevin Kenneth (CPSO#: 63930)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
252 Ester Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 5C3
Phone: (705) 522-3393
Fax: (705) 522-3369
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin K. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 05 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lee ( CPSO# 63930 )

Business Address:
252 Ester Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 5H3
Phone Number: (705) 522-3393

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN KENNETH LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 May 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1992