Lee, Kim Gordon Johnson (CPSO#: 72795)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Apr 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Jan 2000
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Apr 2005