Lee, Kyoung Ho (CPSO#: 92531)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Seoul National University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2010 to 30 Apr 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 May 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Feb 2011