Lee, Marc Frederick (CPSO#: 71987)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Mar 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Mar 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1281 7th Street
Valdor QC  J9P 3S1
Phone: (819) 856-5092
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

101 GOODWIN STREET
PO BOX 2020
Atikokan ON  P0T 1C0
Canada
Phone: (807) 597-4481
County: District of Rainy River
Electoral District: 09

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut
Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 30 Apr 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARC FREDERICK LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jul 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2011