Lee, Michael Hunsu (CPSO#: 95969)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:University of Calgary, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705)728-9090
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

General Internal Medicine
Queen's University
Etherington Hall, Room 1018
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Canada
Phone: (613) 533-2538
Fax: (613) 533-6654
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael H. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 95969 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital Health Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Business Address:
Etherington Hall
1018-94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-2538

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL HUNSU LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2015