Lee, Stefanie Yan (CPSO#: 88961)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Juravinski Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 43897
Fax: (905) 575-2660
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stefanie Y. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lee ( CPSO# 88961 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences - Juravinski Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEFANIE YAN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013