Lee, Yoojung (CPSO#: 97601)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pembroke Regional Hospital
201 Deacon Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 2J6
Phone: 6137323675 Ext. 7209
Fax: 6137322085
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YOOJUNG LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2017