Leece, Pamela Nadine (CPSO#: 90975)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street, 3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: 416-323-7559 Ext. 6
Fax: 416-323-7739
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAMELA NADINE LEECE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEECE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 24 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 02 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2011