Lefebvre, Lisa Gwyneira (CPSO#: 79263)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ontario Medical Association
900 - 150 Bloor St. West
Toronto ON  M5S 3C1
Phone: 4163402866
Fax: 4163402860
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CAMH Work, Stress & Health Program
200 - 455 Spadina Avenue
Toronto ON  M5S 2G8
Canada
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 77369
Fax: (416) 971-7172
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Bellwood Health Services Inc.
175 Brentcliffe Road
Toronto ON  M4G 0C5
Canada
Phone: 416-495-0926
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lisa Lefebvre Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lefebvre ( CPSO# 79263 )

Business Address:
175 Brentcliffe Road
Toronto ON  M4G 0C5

Business Address:
2nd Floor
24 Dalhousie Street
Toronto ON  M5B 2A5

Business Address:
200 - 455 Spadina Avenue
Toronto ON  M5S 2G8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
900 - 150 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M5S 3C1
Phone Number: (416) 340-2866

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bellwood Health Services Inc. Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,- Russell Street Site Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA GWYNEIRA LEFEBVRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEFEBVRE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2005