Legassie, Jenny Maria (CPSO#: 80841)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: 519-621-2330
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Legassie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Legassie ( CPSO# 80841 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Department of Palliative Care
Fontbonne Building-F805
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Palliative Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNY MARIA LEGASSIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEGASSIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2009