Legault, Mathieu Normand (CPSO#: 100225)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynecology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8566
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mathieu Legault Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Legault ( CPSO# 100225)

Business Address:
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3E5
Phone Number: (613) 632-1111

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATHIEU NORMAND LEGAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEGAULT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018