Legault, Pierre-Marc Bourgon (CPSO#: 82096)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Mar 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Mar 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 716
1849 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Phone: (416) 487-3668
Fax: (416) 487-8886
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pierre-Marc Legault Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Legault ( CPSO# 82096 )

Business Address:
716 - 1849 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Phone Number: (416) 487-3668

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PIERRE-MARC BOURGON LEGAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEGAULT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 20 Dec 2004 to 16 Jan 2005
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jan 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2006