Leigh, Richard (CPSO#: 71813)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cape Town, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jun 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jun 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2003