Leiva, Rene Antonio (CPSO#: 79532)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bruyere Continuing Care
Geriatric Rehabilitation
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 562-6262
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Caremedics Elmvale Acres
Unit 18
1910 St Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Canada
Phone: (613) 523-5550
Fax: (613) 523-5580
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rene Leiva Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Leiva ( CPSO# 79532 )

Business Address:
Bruyere Continuing Care
Geriatric Rehabilitation
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone Number: (613) 562-6262

Business Address:
Caremedics Elmvale Acres
Unit 18
1910 St Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Phone Number: (613) 523-5550

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RENE ANTONIO LEIVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEIVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 26 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004