Lelli, Megan Anne (CPSO#: 90722)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
300-100 Marie Curie Pvt.
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone: 613-564-3950 Ext. 224
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEGAN ANNE LELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LELLI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 09 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 10 Apr 2012 to 09 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 10 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 29 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Nov 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 29 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2018