Lemay, Genevieve (CPSO#: 88654)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: Lemay, Genevieve Marie Louise (used until: 07 Aug 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 748-4929
Fax: 613-748-4995
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Geriatric Department
1053 Carling Av.
Ottawa ON  K1K 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 761-4795
Fax: 613-761-5334
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Genevieve Lemay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 06 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Lemay ( CPSO# 88654 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Geriatrics
1053 Carling Avenue
Box 678
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4795

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
Memory Disorder Clinic
Elizabeth Bruyere Hospital
261-Y 75 Bruyere
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone Number: (613) 562-6322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GENEVIEVE LEMAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEMAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2012