Lemire, Marie Louise Celine (CPSO#: 84485)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone: (613) 938-4240
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dang-Lemire Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lemire ( CPSO# 84485 )
Dr. Y. Dang ( CPSO# 84413 )

Business Address:
25 Cumberland Street
Cornwall ON  K6J 4G8
Phone Number: (613) 938-2552

Business Address:
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone Number: (613) 938-4240

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE LOUISE CELINE LEMIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEMIRE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 25 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008