Lemonde, Sylvie Marie Nathalie Sophie (CPSO#: 86593)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 31 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012