Lemos, Nucelio Luiz de Barros Moreira (CPSO#: 111421)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jan 2017

Expiry Date:  01 Jan 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Jan 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:Faculdade De Ciencias Medicas Da Sta: Ca, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mt. Sinai Hospital
700 University Avenue, Room 8-917
OPG Building
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 4991
Fax: (416) 586-4654
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

76 Grenville Street | Room 5449
University of Toronto - Women's Col
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6400 Ext. 4310
Fax: (416) 323-6237
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nucelio Lemos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Lemos ( CPSO# 111421)

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
8-917 - 700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Wasser Pain Clinic
1160 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
University of Toronto
Women's College
5449 - 76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Brazil

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 27 Jan 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jan 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Nov 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Sep 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 01 Jan 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Sep 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Nucelio Luiz de Barros Moreira Lemos may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Obstetrics & Gynaecology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Lemos
                        holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Lemos no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


            Note: This certificate is issued on January 27, 2017, and currently has an
                  interim expiry date of January 1, 2020.  The expiry date of this
                  certificate may be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraph 2.