Leneman, Michal (CPSO#: 74861)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1881 Yonge Street
Suite 503
Toronto ON  M4S 3C4
Phone: (647) 748-1881
Fax: (647) 748-1882
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke, Ontario
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 747-3500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAL LENEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LENEMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2002