Lenga, Ilan (CPSO#: 72318)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
300 Gordon St.
Whitby ON  L1N 5T2
Phone: (905) 444-6688
Fax: (905) 444-6687
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ilan Lenga Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Lenga ( CPSO# 72318 )

Business Address:
1-145 - 300 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5T2
Phone Number: (905) 444-6688

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health,Whitby Site Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 15 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ILAN LENGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LENGA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002