Badowski, Sophia Oliveira (CPSO#: 105973)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: Lenson, Sophia Oliveira (used until: 17 Dec 2017 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynecology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: 6138889851
Electoral District: 06

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOPHIA OLIVEIRA BADOWSKI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BADOWSKI is enrolled at QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. BADOWSKI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BADOWSKI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BADOWSKI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BADOWSKI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BADOWSKI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019