Leone, Karen Louise (CPSO#: 81090)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: Hogle, Karen Louise (used until: 21 Jun 2004 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Tri City Colonoscopy Clinics
Suite 200
50 Sportsworld Crossing Road
Kitchener ON  N2P 0A4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen Leone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Leone ( CPSO# 81090 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Waterloo ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Business Address:
200 - 50 Sportsworld Crossing Road
Kitchener ON  N2P 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 650-2777

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN LOUISE LEONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2009