Leong, Shaun Wai Hong (CPSO#: 93209)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: 416-495-2400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John C.S. Leong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Leong ( CPSO# 93209 )
Dr. J. Leong ( CPSO# 29249 )
Dr. M. Leong ( CPSO# 89084 )

Business Address:
110 - 100 Humber College Blvd.
Etobicoke ON  M9V 5G4
Phone Number: (416) 745-5459


Corporation Name: Shaun Wai Hong Leong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Novosedlik ( CPSO# 92941 )
Dr. S. Leong ( CPSO# 93209 )

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Business Address:
2660 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1K 2S3

Business Address:
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAUN WAI HONG LEONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014