Leontiadis, Grigorios Ioannis (CPSO#: 89692)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 31 Jul 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:Aristotelian University of Thessaloniki, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences Centre
Office 3V3
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73655
Fax: (905) 526-0594
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G.I. Leontiadis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Leontiadis ( CPSO# 89692 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Health Sciences Centre
Office 3V3
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective: 31 Jul 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2013 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Grigorios Ioannis Leontiadis may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of  Gastroenterology,  McMaster  University, in which Dr.
                        Leontiadis holds an academic appointment at  the  rank of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Leontiadis
                  no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.